U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hardin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Forfeiture Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [Forfeiture]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 09, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 09, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • February 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Extend Time]
  • January 26, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 21, 2022: [Forfeiture]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 21, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 20, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order]
  • September 03, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • September 01, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 12, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • August 12, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • August 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 05, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 05, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 05, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • August 03, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • August 03, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 02, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 20, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 20, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • July 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.