U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baird
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 16, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • December 16, 2022: [Sealed Motion - Court Use]
  • December 10, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Extend Time]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • June 29, 2022: [Addendum]
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • June 06, 2022: [Trial Reminder]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 25, 2022: [Bail Revocation Hearing]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • April 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2022: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 10, 2022: [Continue Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause]
  • November 19, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 19, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • November 19, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2021: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2021: [Show Cause]
  • November 05, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 08, 2021: [Continue Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • September 23, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • September 23, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 21, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • September 21, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 21, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • September 21, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 21, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • September 08, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 08, 2021: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
  • September 03, 2021: [Organizational Victim]
  • September 03, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 03, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.