U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00153-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Francis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Mandate]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • January 23, 2023: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • January 09, 2023: [Bail]
  • January 09, 2023: [Suppress]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • November 20, 2022: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • November 10, 2022: [Extend Time]
  • November 03, 2022: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
  • October 31, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • October 17, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • October 06, 2022: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • September 27, 2022: [Suppress]
  • September 20, 2022: [Trial Reminder]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 18, 2022: [Continue Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 18, 2022: [Addendum]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 09, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 03, 2022: [Addendum]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Bill of Particulars]
  • January 19, 2022: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 06, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • December 27, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 14, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • December 14, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 03, 2021: [Continue Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 01, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • October 01, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • September 29, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order]
  • September 29, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 22, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 15, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 14, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 14, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 14, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.