U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00255-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Solis-Ortega et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 17, 2023: [Collateral Receipt]
  • January 11, 2023: [Collateral Return Acknowledgment]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 09, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • October 06, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • June 21, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • June 13, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • May 27, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • April 20, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • April 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • April 14, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • March 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • February 28, 2022: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • February 22, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • February 09, 2022: [Collateral Returned]
January, 2022
  • January 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Terminated Motion]
  • December 22, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • December 21, 2021: [Collateral Receipt]
  • December 21, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • December 13, 2021: [Collateral Return Acknowledgment]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 11, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • November 05, 2021: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • October 21, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • October 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 30, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • September 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 29, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • September 28, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 28, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • September 28, 2021: [Collateral Receipt]
  • September 28, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 28, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 28, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 28, 2021: [Arrest]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • September 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 28, 2021: [Seal Case]
  • September 28, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.