U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-adr-00004
  • Case Name: In re: Daniel W. McKenna
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [~Attorney Discipline-Case Closing]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [~Attorney Discipline - Order]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [~Attorney Discipline - Order to Show Cause]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Attorney Discipline - Order]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [~Attorney Discipline - Order]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [~Attorney Discipline - Order to Show Cause]
  • October 13, 2021: [~Attorney Discipline-Case Opening]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.