U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00067
  • Case Name: US Department of Labor, Secretary of Labor v. R&L Carriers Shared Services, LLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Leave to File]
  • September 15, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
  • September 01, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • September 01, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
  • September 01, 2022: [Reconsideration]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Stay]
  • August 31, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 29, 2022: [Leave to File]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • August 09, 2022: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Objection to Magistrate Judges Decision Rule 72a]
  • May 12, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum]
  • January 24, 2022: [Response - not to Motion]
  • January 17, 2022: [Transcript]
  • January 13, 2022: [Oral Argument]
  • January 10, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • December 08, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • November 05, 2021: [Response - not to Motion]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Attorney Appearance]
  • October 26, 2021: [Extend Time]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 22, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • October 22, 2021: [Answer to]
  • October 22, 2021: [Disclosure Statement]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice - ECF]
  • October 14, 2021: [Case Assigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.