U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00183-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Adams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 12, 2022: [Extend Time]
  • April 05, 2022: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • April 04, 2022: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Forfeiture Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • March 09, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • March 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 23, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 18, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 05, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 05, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 05, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.