U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00195-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Espersen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Medical Treatment]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 29, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • September 29, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 29, 2022: [Medical Treatment]
  • September 28, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 26, 2022: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 20, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Detention Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2022: [Addendum]
  • August 09, 2022: [Cure Notice - Action Requested]
  • August 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • August 04, 2022: [Bail]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 18, 2022: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Bail Revocation Hearing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Arrest]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 14, 2022: [Addendum]
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 03, 2022: [Bail Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • April 29, 2022: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • April 29, 2022: [Bail]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 15, 2022: [Terminate Motions PUBLIC]
  • April 15, 2022: [Speedy Trial]
  • April 15, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • April 13, 2022: [Trial Reminder]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 23, 2022: [Addendum]
  • February 22, 2022: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 22, 2022: [Final Pretrial Conference]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 19, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 14, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • January 13, 2022: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • December 16, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • December 16, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 07, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • December 07, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • December 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 07, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.