U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00317-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Denbow et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • November 15, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • September 19, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 18, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • August 12, 2022: [Amend]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • July 20, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • June 08, 2022: [Speedy Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 19, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • May 16, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • May 12, 2022: [Bail]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • March 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial]
  • March 25, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • March 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • March 22, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • February 01, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • January 19, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • January 03, 2022: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • January 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 03, 2022: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 03, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 03, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • December 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • December 21, 2021: [Waiver of]
  • December 21, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 21, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 20, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 20, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 20, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • December 20, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 20, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.