U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00329-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Copeland
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Transcript]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • January 28, 2022: [Detention Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • January 28, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • January 28, 2022: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • January 28, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • January 24, 2022: [Witness List]
  • January 21, 2022: [In Chambers Conference]
  • January 13, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • January 04, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 29, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 29, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • December 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 29, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 28, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 28, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 27, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • December 23, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 23, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.