U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00016
  • Case Name: Foistner v. USA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Assent to Motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Sealed Motion - Court Use]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • October 24, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 21, 2022: [Recusal Order]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 01, 2022: [Withdrawal of Counsel - Individual]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 30, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Joinder in Motion]
  • April 18, 2022: [Discovery]
  • April 15, 2022: [Hearing Notice]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • April 14, 2022: [Z-Applications]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.