U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Phinney
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • December 07, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2022: [Bail Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • November 29, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • November 22, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2022: [Bail Revocation Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 09, 2022: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Attorney Withdrawal]
  • May 26, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • May 12, 2022: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • May 12, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • May 12, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 03, 2022: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • May 03, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 03, 2022: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 03, 2022: [Complaint]
  • May 03, 2022: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.