U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dias
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Administrative Closure]
  • December 22, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • December 22, 2022: [LASER - Notice]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [In Chambers Conference]
  • November 03, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 25, 2022: [Bail Hearing]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • October 18, 2022: [Bail]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 18, 2022: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • August 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 20, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.