U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 17, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 18, 2022: [Continue Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 01, 2022: [Continue Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Detention Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Trial Reminder]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 15, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 12, 2022: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • July 08, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 05, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 29, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 23, 2022: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 22, 2022: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 21, 2022: [Detention Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 20, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
  • June 17, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 16, 2022: [Trial Notice]
  • June 16, 2022: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • June 16, 2022: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • June 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 16, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 16, 2022: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 16, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 16, 2022: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.