U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diaz et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Stipulation]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • October 31, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 17, 2022: [Terminate Motions PUBLIC]
  • August 17, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • August 17, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 17, 2022: [Trial Reminder]
  • August 11, 2022: [Organizational Victim]
  • August 11, 2022: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 14, 2022: [Trial Notice]
  • July 14, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 13, 2022: [Collateral Receipt]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Excuse]
  • July 13, 2022: [Excuse]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 13, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 13, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 13, 2022: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 13, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 13, 2022: [Arrest - Other District]
  • July 13, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 13, 2022: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 13, 2022: [Sealed Motion - Court Use]
  • July 13, 2022: [Indictment - Sealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.