U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-fp-00328
  • Case Name: Flores v. NH, State of et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 10, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
  • November 01, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Filing Fee Omitted Notice]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
  • September 19, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2254]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.