U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00333
  • Case Name: Abdel-Rahman v. FCI Berlin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Motion Referred & Submitted - Dispositive]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Return of Service Executed as to USA/SSA]
  • November 09, 2022: [Return of Service Executed as to USA/SSA]
  • November 01, 2022: [Clerk Service]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Directing Service]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Complete Application or Fee Paid]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.