U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00379
  • Case Name: Bocelli v. Private Jet Services Group, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Request for Findings of Fact]
  • October 10, 2024: [Trial Brief]
  • October 09, 2024: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • October 09, 2024: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 04, 2024: [In Limine]
  • October 04, 2024: [Request for Findings of Fact]
  • October 04, 2024: [Extend Time]
  • October 04, 2024: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 04, 2024: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 04, 2024: [Pretrial Statement]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [Discovery Plan]
  • January 10, 2023: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • January 10, 2023: [Disclosure Statement]
  • January 06, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 06, 2023: [Answer to]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • December 28, 2022: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • December 09, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • December 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 09, 2022: [Counterclaim]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • November 30, 2022: [Extend Time]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • October 11, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 11, 2022: [Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • October 11, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • September 26, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • September 26, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • September 23, 2022: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.