U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00385
  • Case Name: Mcneil v. Deutsche Bank
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Trial Notice]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 10, 2022: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [State Court Record]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • September 28, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • September 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • September 28, 2022: [Attorney Appearance]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.