U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00383
  • Case Name: Oak Brook Condominium Owners' Association v. Dufresne
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • November 08, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
  • October 25, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 17, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • October 17, 2022: [Attorney Appearance]
  • October 07, 2022: [Amend]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Addendum]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • September 28, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 28, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • September 27, 2022: [Amend]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.