U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00381
  • Case Name: Rasor v. NH State Prison for Men, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 24, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice - Other]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Objection to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Addendum]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Fee Paid]
  • September 27, 2022: [Filing Fee Omitted Notice]
  • September 27, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • September 27, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
  • September 27, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2254]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.