U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00386
  • Case Name: Mahoney v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Objection not to motion]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2022: [Strike]
  • November 14, 2022: [Objection not to motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
  • November 04, 2022: [Objection not to motion]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
  • October 24, 2022: [Motion Referred & Submitted - Dispositive]
  • October 20, 2022: [Joinder]
  • October 13, 2022: [State Court Record]
  • October 13, 2022: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • October 13, 2022: [Objection not to motion]
  • October 05, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • September 29, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.