U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00388
  • Case Name: Gedeon v. United HealthCare Services, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel - Not on Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [In Chambers Conference]
  • January 19, 2023: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • January 17, 2023: [Hearing Notice]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Addendum]
  • October 17, 2022: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • October 17, 2022: [Compel]
  • October 17, 2022: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • October 14, 2022: [Compel]
  • October 11, 2022: [Response - not to Motion]
  • October 05, 2022: [Objection not to motion]
  • October 05, 2022: [State Court Record]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • October 04, 2022: [Extend Time to Answer]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • September 29, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • September 28, 2022: [Attorney Appearance]
  • September 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.