U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00389
  • Case Name: Bogdanov v. FCI Berlin, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • January 24, 2023: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • January 13, 2023: [Addendum]
  • January 11, 2023: [Response - not to Motion]
  • January 11, 2023: [Status Report]
  • January 03, 2023: [Objection to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Expedite]
  • December 21, 2022: [Motion Referred & Submitted - Dispositive]
  • December 07, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 22, 2022: [Addendum]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice Regarding Summary Judgment]
  • November 21, 2022: [Addendum]
  • November 21, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • November 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2022: [Extend Time to Answer]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Return of Service Executed]
  • October 05, 2022: [Clerk Service]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Directing Service]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • September 29, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • September 29, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2241]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Filing to USA - 2255/2241]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.