U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00391
  • Case Name: Strahan v. McNamara et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • November 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • November 28, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
  • November 21, 2022: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • November 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 15, 2022: [Hearing]
  • November 15, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • November 04, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
  • November 03, 2022: [Attorney Appearance]
  • November 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 01, 2022: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 31, 2022: [Hearing]
  • October 31, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 29, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [USM Return]
  • October 27, 2022: [USM Return]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • October 24, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 24, 2022: [Attorney Appearance]
  • October 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 21, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • October 21, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Directing Service]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 30, 2022: [Recusal Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • September 30, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • September 30, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 30, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
  • September 30, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.