U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00422
  • Case Name: Hug v. LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • January 03, 2023: [Case Settlement]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 23, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 07, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • November 07, 2022: [State Court Record]
  • November 04, 2022: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • October 24, 2022: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • October 19, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • October 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.