U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00426
  • Case Name: Walsh v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 23, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 18, 2023: [Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Trial Notice]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Discovery Plan]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • November 30, 2022: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 22, 2022: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • November 21, 2022: [Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • November 15, 2022: [State Court Record]
  • November 15, 2022: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • November 01, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • November 01, 2022: [Crossclaim]
  • November 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 21, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • October 21, 2022: [Case Opening Error]
  • October 21, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • October 21, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.