U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00418
  • Case Name: Pacaya v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Report and Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 21, 2022: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 24, 2022: [Reconsideration]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.