U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00430
  • Case Name: Mercedes-Guerrero v. FCI Berlin, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 24, 2023: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • January 23, 2023: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 20, 2023: [Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • January 13, 2023: [Transport Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Show Cause]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Motion Referred & Submitted - Dispositive]
  • December 12, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice Regarding Summary Judgment]
  • November 28, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 09, 2022: [Return of Service Executed as to USA/SSA]
  • November 08, 2022: [Return of Service Executed]
  • November 03, 2022: [Fee Paid]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Clerk Service]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Directing Service]
  • October 24, 2022: [Filing Fee Omitted Notice]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Filing to USA - 2255/2241]
  • October 24, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • October 24, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2241]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.