U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pincoske
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • November 07, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • November 07, 2022: [Recusal Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 03, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 01, 2022: [Trial Notice]
  • November 01, 2022: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • November 01, 2022: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • November 01, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • November 01, 2022: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 28, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 25, 2022: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 25, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 25, 2022: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • October 25, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.