U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Murray
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • November 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Trial Notice]
  • November 01, 2022: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • November 01, 2022: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 25, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 25, 2022: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 25, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 25, 2022: [Recusal Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 25, 2022: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • October 25, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.