U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00437
  • Case Name: Crump v. FCI Berlin, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • January 20, 2023: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • January 13, 2023: [Transport Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Show Cause]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Motion Referred & Submitted - Dispositive]
  • December 16, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
  • December 16, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Return of Service Executed as to USA/SSA]
  • November 10, 2022: [Return of Service Executed]
  • November 01, 2022: [Fee Paid]
  • November 01, 2022: [Clerk Service]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Directing Service]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Filing Fee Omitted Notice]
  • October 27, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Filing to USA - 2255/2241]
  • October 27, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2241]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.