U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00440
  • Case Name: Stilkey v. Eastern Propane Gas, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Trial Notice]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • November 29, 2022: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 09, 2022: [Attorney Appearance]
  • November 04, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 01, 2022: [State Court Record]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • October 31, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • October 27, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.