U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00444
  • Case Name: Dynocom, Inc. v. PTISubCo, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Sealed Motion - Court Use]
  • January 17, 2023: [Sealed Document]
  • January 12, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 03, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 30, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • November 18, 2022: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • November 18, 2022: [Attorney Appearance]
  • November 07, 2022: [Return of Service Executed]
  • November 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • November 01, 2022: [Case Opening Error]
  • November 01, 2022: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • November 01, 2022: [Case Assigned]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.