U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00446
  • Case Name: ArtBnk Inc. et al v. Edelman
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • December 22, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 20, 2022: [Return of Service Executed]
  • December 20, 2022: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • December 20, 2022: [Attorney Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • November 01, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • October 31, 2022: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.