U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00451
  • Case Name: Sheppard v. O'Leary
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 03, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • December 21, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • December 20, 2022: [Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • December 01, 2022: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice Regarding Service]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 01, 2022: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • November 01, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • November 01, 2022: [Case Assigned]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.