U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00441
  • Case Name: Digrazia v. FCI Berlin, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Appellate Case Number]
  • January 06, 2023: [Clerks Certificate]
  • January 06, 2023: [Appeal Cover Sheet]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • December 23, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • December 13, 2022: [Fee Paid]
  • December 06, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Filing Fee Omitted Notice]
  • November 01, 2022: [Complete Application or Fee Paid]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.