U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00443
  • Case Name: Yufenyuy v. FCI Berlin, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • January 23, 2023: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • January 20, 2023: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 20, 2023: [Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • January 13, 2023: [Transport Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Show Cause]
  • January 12, 2023: [Motion Referred & Submitted - Dispositive]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice Regarding Summary Judgment]
  • December 07, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Directing Service]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Filing to USA - 2255/2241]
  • November 01, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • November 01, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2241]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.