U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00456
  • Case Name: Harrington v. Scranton Manufacturing Company, Inc..
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Attorney Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 21, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 06, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • December 05, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 05, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • December 05, 2022: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • December 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • November 04, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • November 04, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • November 03, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • November 03, 2022: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.