U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00463
  • Case Name: Forester v. ADP TotalSource, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 20, 2023: [Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [State Court Record]
  • November 16, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • November 14, 2022: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • November 11, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 08, 2022: [ERISA Notice]
  • November 08, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.