U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00469
  • Case Name: Crosby v. Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 22, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • November 17, 2022: [Addendum]
  • November 16, 2022: [Addendum]
  • November 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • November 07, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
  • November 07, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • November 07, 2022: [SSA Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.