U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00464
  • Case Name: Colon v. St Gobain St Gobain
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Trial Notice]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • December 08, 2022: [Discovery Plan]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [State Court Record]
  • November 08, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 08, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 08, 2022: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • November 08, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • November 07, 2022: [Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.