U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00478
  • Case Name: Martinez v. DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 15, 2022: [Trial Notice]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • December 14, 2022: [Discovery Plan]
  • December 02, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 02, 2022: [Attorney Appearance]
  • December 01, 2022: [Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [State Court Record]
  • November 29, 2022: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • November 15, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 10, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • November 09, 2022: [Case Opening Error]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • November 09, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • November 09, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.