U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00513
  • Case Name: Niessen v. Huggins Hospital
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 02, 2024: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2024: [Miscellaneous Filing]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 23, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • January 17, 2023: [Extend Time to Answer]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 15, 2022: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • November 15, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • November 11, 2022: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.