U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00515
  • Case Name: Roasales-Alegria v. FCI Berlin, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 19, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 08, 2022: [Addendum]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Return of Service Executed as to USA/SSA]
  • November 29, 2022: [Return of Service Executed as to USA/SSA]
  • November 18, 2022: [Fee Paid]
  • November 15, 2022: [Clerk Service]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Directing Service]
  • November 14, 2022: [Filing Fee Omitted Notice]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • November 14, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Filing to USA - 2255/2241]
  • November 14, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2241]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.