U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00516
  • Case Name: Rosato v. US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • January 06, 2023: [Extend Time to Answer]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Return of Service Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • November 15, 2022: [SSA Referring Case]
  • November 15, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • November 14, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
  • November 14, 2022: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.