U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00523
  • Case Name: Cambridge Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Broan-NuTone, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Trial Notice]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • January 18, 2023: [Discovery Plan]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • December 23, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • December 12, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 09, 2022: [Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • November 29, 2022: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • November 28, 2022: [Extend Time]
  • November 23, 2022: [Extend Time]
  • November 23, 2022: [Attorney Appearance]
  • November 23, 2022: [State Court Record]
  • November 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 21, 2022: [Case Opening Error]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • November 21, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • November 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.