U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00526
  • Case Name: Atwood v. FCI Berlin, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Report and Recommendation]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 15, 2022: [Return of Service Executed as to USA/SSA]
  • December 15, 2022: [Addendum]
  • December 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2022: [Return of Service Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Fee Paid]
  • November 28, 2022: [Clerk Service]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Directing Service]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Filing to USA - 2255/2241]
  • November 22, 2022: [Filing Fee Omitted Notice]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • November 22, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • November 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2241]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.