U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Fitzmorris et al v. NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Conference Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Status Conference]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [In Chambers Conference]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 20, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 18, 2023: [Objection to Motion]
  • January 18, 2023: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • January 18, 2023: [Hearing Notice]
  • January 17, 2023: [Objection to Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Strike]
  • January 17, 2023: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Terminate Motions PUBLIC]
  • December 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • December 20, 2022: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • December 19, 2022: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 19, 2022: [Addendum]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • December 15, 2022: [Amend]
  • December 05, 2022: [Rescheduling Motion Hearing]
  • December 01, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Attorney Appearance]
  • November 22, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.