U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00530
  • Case Name: Superior Plus Energy Services, Inc. v. RYFF 13, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • January 19, 2023: [Attorney Appearance]
  • January 18, 2023: [Waiver of Service Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • December 01, 2022: [Attorney Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • November 23, 2022: [Attorney Appearance]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 22, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • November 22, 2022: [Disclosure Statement]
  • November 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 22, 2022: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.